Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brookdale Senior Living Inc, Welltower Pegasus Landlord Llc, filed a(n) Tax Appraisal - Tax case represented by Albright Andrew Blaine, against Travis Central Appraisal District, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2020 |
CategoryAppraisal Review |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeTax Appraisal |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: September 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CVD:AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL OR PARTIAL DISPOSITION ORDER (Judicial Officer: MAUZY, CATHERINE A) AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT Party: Plaintiff BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC; Plaintiff WELLTOWER PEGASUS LANDLORD LLC Party 2: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE PLAINTIFF S DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL AND ATTORNEY-IN-CHARGE Party: Plaintiff BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC; Plaintiff WELLTOWER PEGASUS LANDLORD LLC | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANT?S ORIGINAL ANSWER Event Code: 5150 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION-TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION SERVICE CST5 Event Code: 830 Adjmt Amount: 80.00 Party: Plaintiff BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.