Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Menocal , Francisco, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pockrus Ronald Earl, against Benouis , Catherine Dee, Kucera , Isabel Catherine, represented by Applewhite Rebecca Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: September 23, 2020ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: September 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED Event Code: 5601 | |
April 17, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED Event Code: 5601 | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) Event Code: 4615 | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Event Code: 8225 | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE Event Code: 5265 Party: Plaintiff MENOCAL, FRANCISCO | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATE FRANCISCO MAURICO MENOCAL Event Code: 5415 Party: Defendant KUCERA, ISABEL CATHERINE | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS IN ACCORDANCE WITH TRE 902(10) AND TCPRC 18.001 Event Code: 5554 | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION-CATHERINE DEE BENOUIS Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant BENOUIS, CATHERINE DEE | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION-ISABEL CATHERINE KUCERA Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant KUCERA, ISABEL CATHERINE | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.