Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Doe , Jane, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Slack Michael L., Tuegel Michelle Simpson, represented by Amstutz Paige Arnette, Hashmi Sameer Asif, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryPerpetuate Testimony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
RESPONSE
Date: October 28, 2020ORD:DENIED MOTION/APPLICATION
Date: October 30, 2020AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: October 29, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: September 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:DENIED MOTION/APPLICATION ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART JANE DOES RULE 202 VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR ORAL DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code: 8209 | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:DENIED MOTION/APPLICATION | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | PLEADING RULE 202 VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR ORAL DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code: 5054 Party: Plaintiff DOE, JANE | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE RESPONDENT?S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO RULE 202 VERIFIED PET ITION FOR ORAL DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code: 5153 | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NTC:ATTORNEY/COUNSEL RESPONDENT W HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC.?S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE A ND DESIGNATING ATTORNEY-IN-CHARGE Event Code: 5550 | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NTC:ATTORNEY/COUNSEL | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code: 5554 Party: Plaintiff DOE, JANE | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.