Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Straiton , Robert, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Firouzbakht Eric Kamron, against Rudys Texas Bar B Q Llc, Ford Restaurant Group Inc, represented by Fazio Gerard Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Other (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: March 01, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 28, 2018LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 03, 2019ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 05, 2019MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS
Date: August 26, 2019UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 26, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 21, 2020MTN:DISMISS/NONSUIT
Date: May 13, 2020UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:DISMISS/NONSUIT | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:ABATE/STAY GRANTED | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.