Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brookfield Owners Association Inc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Gaines James Paul, against Williams , Sheldon, Williams , Bertha, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryHome Owner Assoc Disputes (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeCondominium |
ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 27, 2018UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 30, 2019MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 30, 2019MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER
Date: September 13, 2019UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 13, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: November 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ISS:ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.