Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cohen, David, Cohen, Megan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donald D. Moore, Iii, against Black Plumbing Services, Llc, represented by William E Berry, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Black Plumbing Answer Answer DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND ORIGINAL ANSWER DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND ORIGINAL ANSWER |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC SERVED SERVED |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Black Plumbing Services, LLC Served 06/30/2023 Returned 07/11/2023 | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Issue Citation Request E-file REQUEST Issue Citation Request Issue Citation Request |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original petition with Exhibit Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.