Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Guerrero, Sarah Lina, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Ihnken, Tyler John, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2023 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for hearing. Appearing OAG, Mo/Sarah Guerrero, & PF/Tyler Ihnken. Mo & PF requested time to consult with an attorney. Case reset to 10/17/23 @ 2:00 pm. AL/aj Case called for hearing. Appearing OAG, Mo/Sarah Guerrero, & PF/Tyler Ihnken. Mo & PF requested time to consult with an attorney. Case reset to 10/17/23 @ 2:00 pm. AL/aj |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Suit Affecting Parent Child-Relationship (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Luhrs, Amy) | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE - SARAH LINA GUERRERO WAIVER OF SERVICE WAIVER WAIVER OF SERVICE |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation & Precept to Serve IHNKEN, TYLER JOHN Unserved | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) Mailed copy of Signed Order setting court proceeding for 8/22/2023 @ 9:00 a.m. per address listed on order. Mailed copy of Signed Order setting court proceeding for 8/22/2023 @ 9:00 a.m. per address listed on order. |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Signed Order setting court proceeding for 8/22/2023 @ 9:00 a.m. Signed Order setting court proceeding for 8/22/2023 @ 9:00 a.m. |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
IHNKEN_0014403239_OSCP Order Setting Hearing |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
IHNKEN_0014403239_AOPP ORIGINAL PETITION IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP (AOP) Original Petition ORIGINAL PETITION IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP (AOP) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.