Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lisson, Jeffrey Scott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lisson, Kathy Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Other CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Goodwin, Brad, Goodwin, Brad) Other |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE - AGREED (OCA) | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) Final, GBW/LD. Pet with T. Hargrove and Resp not here but she and atty signed decree. No children. Grant div, approve settlement and signed QDRO. No name change. Final, GBW/LD. Pet with T. Hargrove and Resp not here but she and atty signed decree. No children. Grant div, approve settlement and signed QDRO. No name change. |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gossett, Tom) | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Dana Banks Updated Vacation Letter - TO Q 7/18/17 Dana Banks Updated Vacation Letter - TO Q 7/18/17 |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Howard College Records by Affidavit Howard College Records by Affidavit |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice ASU Records by Affidavit ASU Records by Affidavit |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.