Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Levens, Marc C., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Levens, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
08.17.2023- Rule 11 for Temp Orders-Signed by Judge RULE 11 AGREEMENT LETTER for Temporary Orders for Temporary Orders |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Pre-Trial, Cases) 08/04/2023 Reset by Court to 08/18/2023 | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Respondents Original Answer Answer Respondent's Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE COUNTER CLAIM-FAMILY ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
08.03.2023 Rule 11 to Move Temp Hearing RULE 11 AGREEMENT LETTER |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Citation and Precept_DAF_07.24.2023 SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC -SERVED -SERVED |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation & Precept to Serve Levens, Jennifer Served 07/21/2023 Returned 07/24/2023 | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence to Vickie Schaller_DAF_07.20.2023 REQUEST Correspondence to Tom Green County District Clerk Correspondence to Tom Green County District Clerk |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear_DAF_07.19.2023 NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce_DAF_07.19.2023 Original Petition for Divrce Original Petition Original Petition for Divrce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.