Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Peterson, Evette Dawn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greg Conner, against Leasing Associates, Inc., Morse, Joe, Nixon Engineering, Llc, represented by Andrew C. Nelson, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2023 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Nixon Engineering's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Answer Defendant Nixon Engineering, LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Defendant Nixon Engineering, LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Leasing Associates' Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Answer Defendant Leasing Associates, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Defendant Leasing Associates, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
SERVED Cert Mail-NIXON SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC SERVED 6/29/23 SERVED 6/29/23 |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
SERVED CERT MAIL-LEASING ASSOC SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC SERVED 6/20/23 SERVED 6/20/23 |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerks Note CERT MAIL INFO CERT MAIL INFO |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified Mail Morse, Joe Unserved Nixon Engineering, LLC Served 06/29/2023 Returned 07/05/2023 Leasing Associates, Inc. Served 06/20/2023 Returned 06/29/2023 | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Evette Peterson Petition Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.