Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Calhoun, Alicia Marie, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Crowley, James George-Rob, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2023 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for hearieng. Appearing OAG. OAG announced intent to nonsuit. AL/aj Case called for hearieng. Appearing OAG. OAG announced intent to nonsuit. AL/aj |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Luhrs, Amy) | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
TG COVER LETTER AG - REQUEST FOR SERVICE |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation & Precept to Serve CALHOUN, SAMUEL FRANKLIN Unserved | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable On 01/09/24 case called for hearing. Appearing OAG & PF/Samuel Calhoun. Case reset to 03/12/24 @ 9:00 am. AL/aj On 01/09/24 case called for hearing. Appearing OAG & PF/Samuel Calhoun. Case reset to 03/12/24 @ 9:00 am. AL/aj |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Signed Order setting court proceeding for 3/12/2024 @ 9:00 a.m. Signed Order setting court proceeding for 3/12/2024 @ 9:00 a.m. |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) Mailed copy of Signed Order setting court proceeding for 3/12/2024 @ 9:00 a.m. Mailed copy of Signed Order setting court proceeding for 3/12/2024 @ 9:00 a.m. |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
CROWLEY_0014353652_RESET Order Setting Hearing RESET RESET |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Suit Affecting Parent Child-Relationship (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Luhrs, Amy) | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Crowley_0014353652_CPWOS WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.