Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walden, Diana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Patrick W Mcginnis, against Hightower, Katelyn, represented by Denis Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Notice Notice of Change of Address |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendant's answer Defendant's answer |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST Correspondence to Clerk of Court Correspondence to Clerk of Court |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Hightower, Katelyn Served 12/10/2020 Returned 12/14/2020 | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | JURY FEE PAID | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Note | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice PAYMENT OF JURY FEE PAYMENT OF JURY FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.