Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Porras, Tracy D'Awn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Porras, Albert Herrera, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Jay K. Weatherby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay K. Weatherby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copy Returned NOTICE OF JUDGMENT NOTICE OF JUDGMENT |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE - DEFAULT | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CERT./KIDS SAKE - PET/MVNT | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable FINAL HEARING (With Kids) Reported by: Cindy Saunders Petitioner: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; Respondent: (X) Not present, but here by: (X) Waiver (X) Notice of hearing; (X) Respondent was properly served, but has failed to appear and has made default; DECREE APPROVED BY: (X) Petitioner DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE: (X) All Parties ready (X) Evidence heard (X) Divorce Granted. FOR KIDS SAKE: () Both Parents (X) Mother () Father () Other CONSERVATORSHIP: (X) She named SMC; CHILD SUPPORT: No support ordered - father is medically unable to pay. (X) Health Insurance - Mother to reapply for medicaid (X) Medical support - Court finds that Father is medically unable to provide cash medical support for children; VISITATION: At the discretion and direction of Petitioner; PROPERTY AND DEBTS are divided: (X) per Final Decree of Divorce () per settlement agreement as announced on record (X) to party in possession () as noted on inventory in file CHANGE OF NAME: (X) Petitioner's name changed to: Tracy D'Awn Kirby (X) Decree of Divorce signed FINAL HEARING (With Kids) Reported by: Cindy Saunders Petitioner: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; Respondent: (X) Not present, but here by: (X) Waiver (X) Notice of hearing; (X) Respondent was properly served, but has failed to appear and has made default; DECREE APPROVED BY: (X) Petitioner DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE: (X) All Parties ready (X) Evidence heard (X) Divorce Granted. FOR KIDS SAKE: () Both Parents (X) Mother () Father () Other CONSERVATORSHIP: (X) She named SMC; CHILD SUPPORT: No support ordered - father is medically unable to pay. (X) Health Insurance - Mother to reapply for medicaid (X) Medical support - Court finds that Father is medically unable to provide cash medical support for children; VISITATION: At the discretion and direction of Petitioner; PROPERTY AND DEBTS are divided: (X) per Final Decree of Divorce () per settlement agreement as announced on record (X) to party in possession () as noted on inventory in file CHANGE OF NAME: (X) Petitioner's name changed to: Tracy D'Awn Kirby (X) Decree of Divorce signed |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Copy Returned | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) Albert Porras, Pro Se's NOH was returned, "Unable to Forward". Albert Porras, Pro Se's NOH was returned, "Unable to Forward". |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | WAIVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.