Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Luvaul, Johnna Bennett, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Mitchell, Larry Gene, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Jay K. Weatherby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay K. Weatherby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2013 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed - (motions- add completed date) | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) DWOP case called no one appeared. Dimissed. DWOP case called no one appeared. Dimissed. |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called. Tom Davidson to e-file a request for a hearing (1 hr). Case called. Tom Davidson to e-file a request for a hearing (1 hr). |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS AND NOTICE SETTING HEARING | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Enforcement (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing Other CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Pre-Trial, Cases) Other 05/13/2016 Reset by Court to 05/13/2016 |
|
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) Mr. Larry Mitchell called and need more time, had an accident. Mr. Larry Mitchell called and need more time, had an accident. |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Enforcement Hearing Other CANCELED Enforcement Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.