Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Prater, Joanna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Prater, James, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Garland Ben Woodward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Pre-Trial, Cases) | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS 08182023 Proposed Order TEMPORARY ORDERS TEMPORARY ORDERS |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
OFFICER'S CITATION RETURN 08152023 SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC SERVED SERVED |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
1ST AMEND PET FOR DIV 08102023 Amended Petition FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation & Precept to Serve PRATER, JAMES Served 08/01/2023 Returned 08/16/2023 | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 07192023 NOTICE OF HEARING (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PET FOR DIVORCE REQ FOR TO 07192023 Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.