Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wtx Powerline Services, Llc, Carman, Casey, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Jeffrey J. Wolf, against Quality Powerline, Llc, represented by Jeffrey J. Wolf, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC Served Served |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Quality Powerline, LLC Served 07/28/2022 Returned 08/02/2022 | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Quality Powerline, LLC Unserved | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.