Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Camarillo, Martina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zachary Tritico, against Estes, Tommy, Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, Pimco Transportation, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts 119th District Court with Garland Ben Woodward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House119th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Pretrial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) AGREED DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAND AND SCHEDULING ORDER AGREED DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAND AND SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel Plaintiff's Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed - Agreed Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order Proposed Order Proposed - Agreed Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
2023-05-04 P's First Supplemental Notice of Serving Affidavits Affidavit PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF SERVING AFFIDAVITS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF SERVING AFFIDAVITS |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacate CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) Vacate |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
B210247C Order. AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Pretrial Vacate CANCELED Civil Pretrial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) Vacate |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
2022-09-28 Proposed Agreed Motionfor Continuance - Camarillo Motion Agreed Motion for Continuance Agreed Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.