Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Head, James M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Huggins, Kaci Faith, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2014 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED BY WANT OF PROSECUTION (OCA) DISMISSED BY WANT OF PROSECUTION (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Sch PT, GBW. Ms McKillop says parties have reconciled and court can dismiss. Grant Motion to Dismiss. Sch PT, GBW. Ms McKillop says parties have reconciled and court can dismiss. Grant Motion to Dismiss. |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTING DOCKET CALL-FAMILY DOCKET CALL-FAMILY |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Sch PTH, GBW. Ms McKillop believes parties will reconcile. Reset for next Sch Conf. Sch PTH, GBW. Ms McKillop believes parties will reconcile. Reset for next Sch Conf. |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTING DOCKET CALL-FAMILY DOCKET CALL-FAMILY |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) 01/14/2015 Reset by Court to 01/14/2015 01/14/2015 Reset by Court to 01/14/2015 | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Continue to reconcile. but want one more Sch PTH - set MAy Continue to reconcile. but want one more Sch PTH - set MAy |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCKET SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.