Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Albers, Brittney Deeann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Albers, Jason Brian, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called as to AG's MM/Mt-Conf. AG thru Thomas Swett. CP/Brittney Albers in person. NCP/Jason Albers in person. Rec wvd, agrmt reached, signed AO Modif/Conf. PWT/AJ Case called as to AG's MM/Mt-Conf. AG thru Thomas Swett. CP/Brittney Albers in person. NCP/Jason Albers in person. Rec wvd, agrmt reached, signed AO Modif/Conf. PWT/AJ |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MODIFICATION-AG (enter completed date) | |
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Modification Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Talley, Pamala) & to Confirm Support Arrearage & to Confirm Support Arrearage |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SERVICE |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation & Precept to Serve ALBERS, JASON BRIAN Served 10/11/2017 Returned 10/12/2017 | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing (Judicial Officer: Talley, Pamala ) | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Signed OSH set 10/24/17 @ 9:00 a.m. /s/PWT/AJ Signed OSH set 10/24/17 @ 9:00 a.m. /s/PWT/AJ |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY/ENFORCE IV-D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.