Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Cardona, Vanessa Ann Marie, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Munoz, Isaac Esteban, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2023 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) Mt to Mod. Pet(M) pro se / Resp(F) pro se--Motion was filed w/in 1 year of final -Pet doesn't allege any of the necessary grounds for a Mod w/in 1 year--Ct dismissed Mt--However the problem is that neither party undersatnds that there is an order setting out their visitation and their rights--ct made a copy for each----had them read it and asked if they understood--BLW/CW Mt to Mod. Pet(M) pro se / Resp(F) pro se--Motion was filed w/in 1 year of final -Pet doesn't allege any of the necessary grounds for a Mod w/in 1 year--Ct dismissed Mt--However the problem is that neither party undersatnds that there is an order setting out their visitation and their rights--ct made a copy for each----had them read it and asked if they understood--BLW/CW |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Modification Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
A230163AG NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC served served |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation MUNOZ, ISAAC ESTEBAN Served 10/31/2023 Returned 11/02/2023 | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify (OCA) | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Rev'd and Signed Order from 08/24/23 docket. AL/aj Rev'd and Signed Order from 08/24/23 docket. AL/aj |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.