Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Aso Scott Kain, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Matthew D Warner, against Espinoza, Raymundo, Munoz, Mireya, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Carmen Symes Dusek presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order proposed Final Judgment Raymundo Espinoza ONLY proposed Final Judgment Raymundo Espinoza ONLY |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Against Raymundo Espinoza ONLY Motion Motion for Default Judgment Against Raymundo Espinoza ONLY |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC -SERVED -SERVED |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE (Judicial Officer: Dusek, Carmen ) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Petition |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Espinoza, Raymundo Served 11/29/2022 Returned 12/06/2022 | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Munoz, Mireya Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.