Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzales, Nancy Villafana, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2019 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Name Change (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) 11/26/2019 Reset by Court to 11/26/2019 | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Pet present pro se; interpreter obtained from OCA. Evid heard & courty file reviewed. Request granted. CSD/cw Pet present pro se; interpreter obtained from OCA. Evid heard & courty file reviewed. Request granted. CSD/cw |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER CHANGING NAME (Judicial Officer: Dusek, Carmen ) OF AN ADULT OF AN ADULT |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RESET RESET |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING SENT TO Q. 9/18/19 SENT TO Q. 9/18/19 |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.