Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jackson, Teri, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Austin Mathis, against Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Cruz, Leslie, represented by Gregg R. Miller, D. Brooke Osburn, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2018 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable On October 20, the Court heard arguments re a Motion to Consolidate. Plaintiff represented by Holly Voth; Def Farmers by Th. Stevens; Def Trivino by M. Tighe and Def Cruz by Matt Cross. All agree to consolidate. Grant Motion and sign Order. GBW On October 20, the Court heard arguments re a Motion to Consolidate. Plaintiff represented by Holly Voth; Def Farmers by Th. Stevens; Def Trivino by M. Tighe and Def Cruz by Matt Cross. All agree to consolidate. Grant Motion and sign Order. GBW |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerks Note DO NOT ACCEPT ANY NEW FILINGS IN THIS CASE DO NOT ACCEPT ANY NEW FILINGS IN THIS CASE |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE (OCA-New-Closed) (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) Cause # B180350C is consolidated into Cause # B180349C Cause # B180350C is consolidated into Cause # B180349C |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Maternity Leave Notice Notice of Maternity Leave |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Zoom Hearing - Motion to Consolidation of Actions and Pretrial Hearing Order Order for Zoom Hearing - Motion to Consolidation of Actions and Pretrial Hearing |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Darci J. Stoots, DC - Billing R&N Darci J. Stoots, DC - Billing R&N |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Darci J. Stotts, DC - Medical Darci J. Stotts, DC - Medical |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS. NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.