Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walker, Whitney Liane, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Kenner, Stormy Reece, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2017 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Modification Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) 10/15/2020 Reset by Court to 11/12/2020 | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT (EVENT ONLY) WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY ORDERS (Judicial Officer: Dusek, Carmen ) | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order KIDS SAKE WAIVER KIDS SAKE WAIVER |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for Final Hearing on Mother's Mot. Modification of Conservatorship and S. Kenner's Pet. to Establish Paternity. W Walker present pro se. S Kenner present w/ B Raymond. Evid. heard. After 90 minute hearing, Court recessed and continued trial to Nov. 12 at 9:00 a.m. Order granted establishing S Kenner as Fa of Gianna Reign Kenner by agreement of the parties. Temporary Orderes entered until final hearing. Parents JMC of both children. Fa primary w/ right to designate residence. Mo. to have supervised in-person visitation 1/3/5 Sat. from, 10-2 or as otherwise agreed. Supervision by Fa or person approved by him. Mo. also to have video visit each Tuesday 6:30-6:45. Both parents ordered to submit to drug hair folicle test for 90 day sample by end of business for lab on 10/15/2020. Advised that refusal to test may be presumed by court to be a positive result. B Raymond to prepare TO for Court approval. CSD/cw Case called for Final Hearing on Mother's Mot. Modification of Conservatorship and S. Kenner's Pet. to Establish Paternity. W Walker present pro se. S Kenner present w/ B Raymond. Evid. heard. After 90 minute hearing, Court recessed and continued trial to Nov. 12 at 9:00 a.m. Order granted establishing S Kenner as Fa of Gianna Reign Kenner by agreement of the parties. Temporary Orderes entered until final hearing. Parents JMC of both children. Fa primary w/ right to designate residence. Mo. to have supervised in-person visitation 1/3/5 Sat. from, 10-2 or as otherwise agreed. Supervision by Fa or person approved by him. Mo. also to have video visit each Tuesday 6:30-6:45. Both parents ordered to submit to drug hair folicle test for 90 day sample by end of business for lab on 10/15/2020. Advised that refusal to test may be presumed by court to be a positive result. B Raymond to prepare TO for Court approval. CSD/cw |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERT.-KIDS SAKE - DEF/RESPT -STORMY KENNER -STORMY KENNER |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (to Movant's Motion for Enforcement of Visitation Order) RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (to Movant's Motion for Enforcement of Visitation Order) |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.