Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcnally, Mercy Martha, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Drew, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Dean, Sparky presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
release of judgment request and actual release request and actual release Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Dean, Sparky, Dean, Sparky)
Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response and gave court his address b/c the plaintiff has it wrong on the petition. and gave court his address b/c the plaintiff has it wrong on the petition. Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Service Drew, Richard Served 11/21/2019 Response Due 12/05/2019
Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIM CITATION Issued Issued Judge: Dean, Sparky |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.