Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelly Moore Paint Co., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Thornton, Jerry Don, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Deatherage, A. L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeatherage, A. L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Deatherage, A. L.)
Judge: Deatherage, A. L. |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Service Thornton, Jerry Don Served 01/01/2011 Response Due 01/24/2011 Returned 01/14/2011
Judge: Deatherage, A. L. |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Deatherage, A. L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.