Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Webb, Wanda, Webb, Randy, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Schumacher, Korey, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Deatherage, A. L.) | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Small Claims Service Schumacher, Korey Served 12/21/2010 Response Due 01/04/2011 | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.