Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Absolute Real Estate Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Martinez, Anna, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts JP1-1 with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseJP1-1 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Eviction Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Def not present and plaintiff presented evidence of back rent owed of $2000. Judgment for plaintiff for back rent, + CC of $129 total $2129. Def not present and plaintiff presented evidence of back rent owed of $2000. Judgment for plaintiff for back rent, + CC of $129 total $2129. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Anna Martinez Anna Martinez |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Eviction Citation Service Martinez, Anna Served 03/27/2024 Response Due 04/05/2024 | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.