Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
The Edge, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Johnson, Micah, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts JP1-1 with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseJP1-1 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Def not present, default judgment for plaintiff for back rent of $1092 + CC of $129, total $1221. Def not present, default judgment for plaintiff for back rent of $1092 + CC of $129, total $1221. |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Eviction Hearing (11:05 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Micah Johnson - 742 Return Micah Johnson - 742 Return |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Eviction Citation Service Johnson, Micah Served 03/12/2024 Response Due 03/21/2024 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.