Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Mill Creek Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Albertie, Ayla, Resendez, Rey, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts JP1-1 with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseJP1-1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Both parties present and agreed to back tent owed. Judgment for plaintiff for $2320 + CC of $204, total $2524. Both parties present and agreed to back tent owed. Judgment for plaintiff for $2320 + CC of $204, total $2524. |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Eviction Hearing (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Ayla Alberte Ayla Alberte |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Rey Resendez Rey Resendez |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Eviction Citation Service Albertie, Ayla Served 03/07/2024 Response Due 03/18/2024 Resendez, Rey Served 03/07/2024 Response Due 03/18/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.