Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Continental Villa, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Wade, Cecil And Mary D., in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Deatherage, A. L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeatherage, A. L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2007 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Deatherage, A. L.) 12/31/2007 Reset by Court to 01/03/2008
Judge: Deatherage, A. L. |
|
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service Wade, Cecil and Mary D. Unserved
Judge: Deatherage, A. L. |
|
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation
Judge: Deatherage, A. L. |
|
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Deatherage, A. L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.