Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Torres, Ernest, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Rabon, Bobbie, Rabon, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Smith, Bryan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Bryan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2007 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Smith, Bryan)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service Rabon, Bobbie Served 12/26/2007 Response Due 01/04/2008 Returned 12/27/2007 Rabon, Anthony Served 12/26/2007 Response Due 01/04/2008 Returned 12/27/2007
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.