Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Abilene Teachers Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Calhoun, Jeffrey S, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Joiner, Shawna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoiner, Shawna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2023 |
CategoryDebt Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge's Docket Entry | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Hearing (1:40 PM) (Judicial Officers Joiner, Shawna, Joiner, Shawna) | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Returned Envelope | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Debt Claim Citation issued issued |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Citation Service Calhoun, Jeffrey S Served 12/08/2023 Response Due 12/22/2023 | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.