Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Abilene Teachers Fcu, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2022 |
CategoryDebt Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Debt Claim Hearing (10:18 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Emailed ATFCU Emailed ATFCU Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Citation Service SENT TO CONSTABLE Flores, Oscar Jr Served 05/25/2022 Response Due 06/08/2022 SENT TO CONSTABLE Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.