Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Michael J Scott, against Westra, Penny M, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Smith, Bryan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Smith, Bryan)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Citation Service Westra, Penny M Served 01/28/2012 Response Due 02/10/2012 Returned 02/13/2012
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.