Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding L. L. C., filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Laura L Bedford, against Jaquez, Lena, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Smith, Bryan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Bryan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Smith, Bryan)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing Court CANCELED Civil Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Smith, Bryan) Court Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Citation Service Jaquez, Lena Served 01/10/2008 Response Due 01/24/2008 Returned 01/10/2008
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.