Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Michael J. Scott, against Joiner, Rosie, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Smith, Bryan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Bryan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Smith, Bryan)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing Court CANCELED Civil Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Smith, Bryan) Court Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response Defendant's Original Answer filed. Defendant's Original Answer filed. Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Citation Service Joiner, Rosie Served 01/11/2008 Response Due 01/25/2008 Returned 01/15/2008
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.