Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
North Star Capital Acquisitions, Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Michael J. Scott, against Hartless, Bobbie, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Smith, Bryan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Bryan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (2:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Smith, Bryan)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Citation Service Hartless, Bobbie Served 01/18/2008 Response Due 02/01/2008 Returned 01/18/2008
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Smith, Bryan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.