Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Armc, L.P. D B A Abilene Regional Medical Center, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Catherine R Hensley, against Beyleu, Eddie, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Neither party present, case called and DWOPed. Neither party present, case called and DWOPed. |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial notice sent | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 106 Order | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Small Claims Service Beyleu, Eddie Served 07/01/2019 Response Due 07/15/2019 | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIM CITATION | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.