Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Stevens, Devin, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Smith, Sage, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts 326th District Court with Patty Wenetschlaeger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatty Wenetschlaeger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2023 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Filing Court House326th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Court CANCELED Motion Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty) Court 30Min NOH/Motion for Hearing for Court to Decline Jurisdiction: Appear by Webex (Sage Smith) |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Hearing on Motion regarding Jurisdiction: Movant Mo via WebEx w/M. Magincalda, Resp ProSe. Testimony and Evidence presented. Under advisement. (PW) Hearing on Motion regarding Jurisdiction: Movant Mo via WebEx w/M. Magincalda, Resp ProSe. Testimony and Evidence presented. Under advisement. (PW) |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Deputy Reporter Statement | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty) 30Min. Motion for Hearing for Court to Decline Jurisdiction: Sage Stevens to appear by Webex 30Min. Motion for Hearing for Court to Decline Jurisdiction: Sage Stevens to appear by Webex |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Court CANCELED Motion Hearing (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty) Court 1Hr. Motion for a Hearing for Court to Decline Jurisdiction: Motion to Appear Remotely Webex (Sage Smith) |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Remotely via Electronic Video and Audio to Appear Remotely via Electronic Video and Audio |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Order to Appear Remotely- signed 3.18.24 env# 85678589 to Appear Remotely- signed 3.18.24 env# 85678589 |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.