Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sutterfield, Karsen, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Riddle, Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Patty Wenetschlaeger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Data Up-Date Data Up-Date |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Direct Payment of Direct Payment |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Completion Ben Ben |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Place Of Payment | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Completion | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Withholding Income WH Order/Notice for Support (IWO) Income WH Order/Notice for Support (IWO) |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Service of IWO Request Request for Service of IWO |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Temporary Order in SAPCR in SAPCR |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Direct Payment of Direct Payment |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Associate Judge Report Temp Hearing: Pet w/C.Mehaffey, Res w/C.Allen. Agreement reached per AJReport. No record. Mehaffey to prepare order. pw Temp Hearing: Pet w/C.Mehaffey, Res w/C.Allen. Agreement reached per AJReport. No record. Mehaffey to prepare order. pw |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.