Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Eidson, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2023 |
CategorySeizure/Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Judgment Letter | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Envelope # 79294764 Envelope # 79294764 |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served C BOYD C BOYD |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Original Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture Original Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation C Boyd C Boyd |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Boyd, Christopher De'One Served 05/30/2023 Returned 06/06/2023 | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
request for issuance Request request for issuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.