Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Herd, Jessica Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Herd, Christopher Michael, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Rotenberry, Paul R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRotenberry, Paul R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce Cases With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Temp Hearing: C.Williams for Pet, K.Postell for Resp - announced agreement, Fa to have Expanded SPO, exchanges during school year at school, exchanges during summer at APD. (PW) Temp Hearing: C.Williams for Pet, K.Postell for Resp - announced agreement, Fa to have Expanded SPO, exchanges during school year at school, exchanges during summer at APD. (PW) Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Hearing (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty) NOH/TO NOH/TO Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation And Notice Of Hearing Christopher Christopher Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Hearing & Citation Herd, Christopher Michael Served 10/15/2020 Returned 10/15/2020
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served Christopher Herd Christopher Herd Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance Request Request for Issuance Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Hearing
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear Notice Of Hearing Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion To Modify (OCA) Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.