Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept. Of Child Support Services, against Bueno, Chad, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time129 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
DCSS Motion (Enforcement) contempt Judge: Stockdale Coleman, Myrlys |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to drop 5/29/2020 hearing |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
DCSS Motion: Enforcement contempt |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Warrant: Returned and Filed | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Warrant: Returned Unserved | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Warrant: Ordered | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Sentencing
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.