Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sexton, Rhonda Kay, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mastin, William Arthur, Bean, Renee Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Rotenberry, Paul R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRotenberry, Paul R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryAg Suit Affecting (Title Iv-D Support Order) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeOrder In Suit Affecting The Parent-Child Relationship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Envelope Rene Rene Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment Letter Renee Renee Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order In Suit Affecting The Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment Letter William - both addresses William - both addresses Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Completion
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Appearances: Pet with atty, K. Mulcahy. Resp, Renee Bean, filed a waiver and dna. Resp, William Mastin, served and defaulted. Pet appointed SMC, Respondents named PC. Visitation to occur as agreed by the parties. Each Respondent is ordered to pay C.S. set at $250 per month beg Nov. 1, 2015, and each Respondent is ordered to pay M/S set at $50 per month beg Nov. 1, 2015. AG to sign off the order. Ms. Mulcahy is to prepare the order. Appearances: Pet with atty, K. Mulcahy. Resp, Renee Bean, filed a waiver and dna. Resp, William Mastin, served and defaulted. Pet appointed SMC, Respondents named PC. Visitation to occur as agreed by the parties. Each Respondent is ordered to pay C.S. set at $250 per month beg Nov. 1, 2015, and each Respondent is ordered to pay M/S set at $50 per month beg Nov. 1, 2015. AG to sign off the order. Ms. Mulcahy is to prepare the order. Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Docket /Walk-ins (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rotenberry, Paul R.)
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served William Arthur Mastin William Arthur Mastin Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Mastin, William Arthur Unserved
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation William William Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.