Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hymel, Leah Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hymel, Steffen Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Hacker, Aleta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHacker, Aleta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce Cases With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDecree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amended Administrative Writ Of Withholding-AG
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended Administrative Writ Of Withholding-AG
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Administrative Writ
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended Administrative Writ Of Withholding-AG
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Administrative Writ
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended Administrative Writ Of Withholding-AG
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended Administrative Writ Of Withholding-AG
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Response from employer (U.S. Coast Guard) Response from employer (U.S. Coast Guard) Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Administrative Writ
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Administrative Writ Of Withholding-AG
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.