Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morgan, Bethany, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Morgan, Daniel Robert, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Hacker, Aleta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHacker, Aleta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeNotice And Order Of Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain case on docket case on docket Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order To Retain case on docket case on docket Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Returned Envelope Daniel Morgan-Dism. Notice Daniel Morgan-Dism. Notice Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Notice
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Setting Letter
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
CITATION-AG filed w/clerk 1/4/08 Morgan, Bethany Served 12/31/2007 Returned 01/04/2008 filed w/clerk 1/4/08 Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issuance Sheet
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
CITATION-AG filed 2/12/08 Morgan, Daniel Robert, III Served 01/30/2008 Returned 02/12/2008 filed 2/12/08 Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.