Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marshall, Brian L., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marshall, Rachel V., in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Hacker, Aleta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHacker, Aleta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce Cases With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDecree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Process server of Process server Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Completion Brian Marshall Brian Marshall Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hacker, Aleta)
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Requiring Completion Of Children And Divorce Program
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation On Divorce & Temporary Restraining Order Rachel V Marshall Rachel V Marshall Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation And Temp. Restraining Order rtn filed with clerk 3-12-8 Marshall, Rachel V. Served 02/13/2008 Returned 03/12/2008 rtn filed with clerk 3-12-8 Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order And ORder Setting Hearing For Temporary Orders And ORder Setting Hearing For Temporary Orders Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issuance Sheet
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.