Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Emily Sterling filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Martin, James Lee, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts 326th District Court with Rotenberry, Paul R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRotenberry, Paul R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2023 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court House326th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Motion Hearing: Movant w/C.Mehaffey, Applicant w/E.Sterling. Parties announced agreement for modification of PO, approved by Court. Ms. Sterling to draft order. (PW) Motion Hearing: Movant w/C.Mehaffey, Applicant w/E.Sterling. Parties announced agreement for modification of PO, approved by Court. Ms. Sterling to draft order. (PW) |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty) 1Hr. NOH/Motion to Modify Protectvie Order 1Hr. NOH/Motion to Modify Protectvie Order |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Assoc Judge's Rept and Memorandum Order for Child Support Signed March 20, 2024 Signed March 20, 2024 |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request Application for Subpoena Application for Subpoena |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena J Green J Green |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Protective Order | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Notification of Change of Address and Corrected Date of Birth Notification of Change of Address and Corrected Date of Birth |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion To Modify (OCA) | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List FM68 FM68 |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Letter to Agencies to Agencies |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.