Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Castaneda, Crystal Nicole filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Allen, Nicholas Blaze, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Rotenberry, Paul R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2019 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter to Agencies Letter Letter to Agencies Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter to Respondent Letter Letter to Respondent Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter to Applicant Letter Letter to Applicant Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Protective Order signed (2010) C. Castaneda Agreed Final Ordered C. Castaneda Agreed Final Ordered Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Assoc Judge's Rept and Memorandum Order for Child Support
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ten Day Letter
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Associate Judge Report PO Hearing: Pet w/M.Mogish, Res ProSe. Crsytal Nicole Castaneda Granted a protective order. Child provisions for access to Father until hearing in January. Exchange at APD. In effect until December 16, 2024. Mogish to prepare order. pw PO Hearing: Pet w/M.Mogish, Res ProSe. Crsytal Nicole Castaneda Granted a protective order. Child provisions for access to Father until hearing in January. Exchange at APD. In effect until December 16, 2024. Mogish to prepare order. pw Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty)
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Brief
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.